Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC v. SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi K Dubose |
Referred: | P Bradley Murray |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC
905 S. Ann Street
Mobile, AL 36606 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC
11 North Royal Street
Suite 20290, AL 36602 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas C. Patti on behalf of SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC (Patti, Nicholas) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Thu 08/15 12:28 PM
REFERRAL OF10 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Murray. (meh) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 08/14 3:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion6 filed by SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC. (Graham, Allen) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Tue 08/06 12:07 PM
REFERRAL OF9 Response to Judge Murray. (meh) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response
Mon 08/05 4:59 PM
RESPONSE to6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC. (Butler, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EX 1-Invoice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EX 2-Demand Package, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EX 3-Email to Bill Prine, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EX 4-March 4 email, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit EX 5-March 7 email, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit EX 6-Counter Demand, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit EX 7-State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit EX 8- Email 4-15, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit EX 9- Email, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit EX 10-Additional Email, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit EX 11-April 25 email, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit EX 12-Addional April 25 email, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit EX-13 June 5 email, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit EX 14-Served in State Court, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit EX 15-June 25 email, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit EX 16-DY removed MP, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit EX 17-Motion to Consolidate, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit EX 18-Order with Deadline, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit EX 19-DY Motion to Dismiss | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
Tue 07/23 2:31 PM
Order Setting Motion Deadline re:6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC. Response due by 8/5/2024. Reply due by 8/14/2024. Motion to be taken under submission on 8/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/23/2024. (aws) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions Referred Document Referred
Fri 07/12 8:49 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 MOTION to Dismiss and REFERRAL OF7 Brief to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief
Thu 07/11 3:57 PM
Brief filed by SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC. (Graham, Allen) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/11 3:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC. (Graham, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit c | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/24 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC. SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC served on 6/20/2024, answer due 7/11/2024 (Butler, M.) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/20 11:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/20 10:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC. (Powell, Virgina) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
Thu 06/20 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC (Powell, Virgina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against SPI/Mobile Pulley Works, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3416423, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dredge Yard, Inc. DMCC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 9/18/2024. (Powell, Virgina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EX A- Invoice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EX B-Payment Plan Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EX C-Statement of Accounts, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EX D-Outstanding Inv., | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |