Airy Prasanna v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01539 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
|
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Narasimha Prasad Airy Prasanna
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/09 1:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Voluntary re1 Complaint, by Narasimha Prasad Airy Prasanna. (Bless, Jesse) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Mon 09/09 3:38 PM
Civil Case Terminated per11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (kaf) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/27 4:33 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Department of Homeland Security answer due 9/9/2024; Ur M Jaddou answer due 9/9/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/27/2024) (cfk) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/26 12:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ur M Jaddou (Owen-DOJ, Emily) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/26 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Owen-DOJ on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Ur M Jaddou. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Owen-DOJ, Emily) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned
Wed 08/07 8:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Department of Homeland Security ; served on 6/26/2024; Ur M Jaddou ; served on 6/26/2024. (Bless, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Certified Mail Electronic Receipt - USAO, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Certified Mail Electronic Receipt - USAG, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Certified Mail Electronic Receipt - DHS, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D - Certified Mail Electronic Receipt - Jaddou | ||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/21 4:33 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse M. Bless. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/21/2024) (chmb) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 9:36 AM
Summons issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Ur M Jaddou, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (kcr) |
|
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Fri 06/21 3:46 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case (agc) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Lindsay
Fri 06/21 9:34 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/20 3:21 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14708629) filed by Narasimha Prasad Airy Prasanna (Bless, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/20 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Narasimha Prasad Airy Prasanna. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bosco, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Ur M Jaddou filed by Narasimha Prasad Airy Prasanna. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14708530) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bosco, John) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |