Ortman v. Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11599 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Ortman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 09/06 10:56 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 25 Motion for Extension of Time to September 12, 2024 to Respond or Amended (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/05 4:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 12, 2024 to Respond or Amend by Steven Ortman.(Schreiber, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Fri 08/30 10:19 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 23 Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint or Response to Motion to Dismiss due September 5, 2024. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Thu 08/29 6:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Steven Ortman.(Schreiber, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/15 5:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc..(Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
21 | 21
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 08/15 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 08/15 5:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc..(Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/09 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Glunt on behalf of Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Glunt, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/06 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erica G. Wilson on behalf of Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Wilson, Erica) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 08/05 10:32 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James F. Glunt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 08/05 10:29 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erica G. Wilson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/02 1:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James F. Glunt Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10537574 by Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc..(Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/02 1:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erica G. Wilson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10537563 by Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc..(Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 07/31 7:38 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. Josephson, Esq. and Richard M. Schreiber, Esq. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 3:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Josephson, Esq. and Richard M. Schreiber, Esq. Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10531461 by Steven Ortman.(Gordon, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/30 3:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven Ortman. Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc. waiver sent on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (Gordon, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 9:59 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. (Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 07/16 10:02 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. answer due 8/15/2024. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/15 5:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc..(Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Fritz on behalf of Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Fritz, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/26 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. (Hurley, Kristen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/26 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Bio-Medical Applications of Pennsylvania, Inc. served on 6/25/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. (Hurley, Kristen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/26 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M. Hurley on behalf of Steven Ortman (Hurley, Kristen) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 06/21 10:13 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/20 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10472321 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Steven Ortman.(Gordon, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |