U.S. Bank National Association v. Eurolux, LLC
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Richard Nelson |
Referred: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02403 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 4:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
Eurolux, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/06 3:41 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 9/6/2024. (jme) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Order to Judge - Other
Thu 09/05 4:27 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Staying All Case Deadlines & Activity Until October 1, 2024, Pending Completion of Settlement Process22 Motion to Stay. (Stinson, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Stay
Thu 09/05 4:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines & Activity Pending Completion of Settlement Process filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Stinson, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing
Fri 08/16 12:57 PM
**TEXT ONLY** In light of the Amended Complaint filed in this matter, the Hearing set for Friday, September 27, 2024, is CANCELLED. Entered and Ordered by The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson. 08/14/2024 (LLM) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings
Tue 08/13 12:58 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Allow Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Withdraw Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 8/13/2024. (jme) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Mon 08/12 12:24 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re18 Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to allow Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint and Withdraw Motion to Dismiss filed by Eurolux, LLC.(Poncin, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings
Mon 08/12 12:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings to allow Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint and Withdraw Motion to Dismiss filed by Eurolux, LLC. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/11 3:23 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response due by: Friday, August 16, 2024. Reply due by: Friday, September 6, 2024. Signed by The Hon. Susan Richard Nelson on 7/11/2024. (LLM) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order to Judge - Other
Wed 07/10 3:28 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re extending time15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,. (Mah, Scott) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/10 3:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Mah, Scott) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/10 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Mah on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Mah, Scott) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Mon 07/08 2:18 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER. Due to the pending Motion to Dismiss7 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will schedule a pretrial conference, if needed, promptly after a decision is issued on the pending motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 7/8/2024. (jme) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Wed 07/03 3:16 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eurolux, LLC.(Poncin, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Wed 07/03 3:14 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eurolux, LLC.(Poncin, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 07/03 3:13 PM
Declaration of Eurolux, LLC in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eurolux, LLC.(Poncin, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 07/03 3:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eurolux, LLC.(Poncin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 07/03 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 07/03 3:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, for Change of Venue , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eurolux, LLC. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/28 4:23 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Motion4 , and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including July 3, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 6/28/2024. (jme) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Order to Judge - Other
Thu 06/27 3:42 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/27 3:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eurolux, LLC. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Fri 06/21 9:26 AM
EXHIBIT Notice of Filing Notice of Removal re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eurocar, Inc., Eurolux, LLC. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/20 3:21 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-2403 SRN/DLM. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/20 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota County of Hennepin (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11142382) filed by Eurolux, LLC dba Eurocar of Orange County. No summons requested. (Poncin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |