Cohan v. Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01137 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/28 10:46 AM
ORDER re 16 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/28/2024. (REG) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/27 10:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP. (Chotiner, Adam) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 08/05 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/05 10:46 AM
ORDER re 13 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/5/2024. (REG) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of settlement
Fri 08/02 11:38 AM
NOTICE of settlement (Joint) by Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP (Chotiner, Adam) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/26 10:53 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise response to the Complaint on or before August 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/26/2024. (MLS) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 07/25 4:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP. (Chotiner, Adam) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 07/25 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Chotiner on behalf of Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP (Chotiner, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 07/10 9:20 AM
RETURN of service executed on 07/08/2024 by Howard Cohan as to Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Mon 07/08 1:25 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Photographs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Pacer Search | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 07/02 12:43 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/02 12:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 06/26 11:31 AM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/26/2024. (KM) |
|
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Wed 06/26 11:30 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/26/2024. (KM) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 06/21 3:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP. (BGR) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/21 1:44 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-1137-PGB-RMN. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Sea Harbor Hospitality, LLP (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22220148) filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |