Smith v. Panic Recovery LLC et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | R Stan Baker |
Referred: | Christopher L Ray |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00130 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
DCR & Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Casey Knowles
|
|
Defendant
Randall Knowles
|
|
Defendant
Panic Recovery LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to DCR & Company LLC. (csr) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 06/21 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Ashley Smith of corrected civil cover sheet re: 1 Complaint. (Skaar, Kris) Modified on 6/21/2024 (csr) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 06/21 10:52 AM
Summons Submitted (Skaar, Kris) |
|
3 | 3
order
Rule 26(f) Order
Fri 06/21 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Standing Order regarding cases pending before Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker. ([LINK:Click Here to View Standing Order)] RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/21/24. (wwp) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 9:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Casey Knowles, Randall Knowles, Panic Recovery LLC.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1 summons, | ||
Att: 2 summons, | ||
Att: 3 summons | ||
notice
Notice to Counsel (CLR Forms)
Fri 06/21 9:20 AM
Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form.[LINK:CLICK HERE TO READ] . (wwp) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/21 10:26 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AGASDC -3847737. (wwp) |
||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 9:15 AM
COMPLAINT against DCR & Company LLC, Casey Knowles, Randall Knowles, Panic Recovery LLC, filed by Ashley Smith.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |