Lynk Media LLC v. IHeartMedia, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jason K Pulliam |
Referred: | Elizabeth S Chestney |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00691 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
IHeartMedia, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lynk Media LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/26 9:39 AM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. The deadline for Defendant iHeartMedia Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended up to and including September 30, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 08/27 9:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: IHeartMedia, Inc. answer due 9/30/2024. (mgr) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/23 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by IHeartMedia, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Phillips, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 08/23 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey J. Phillips on behalf of IHeartMedia, Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey J. Phillips added to party IHeartMedia, Inc.(pty:dft) (Phillips, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynk Media LLC. IHeartMedia, Inc. served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/10 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Lynk Media LLC. Attorney James H. Freeman added to party Lynk Media LLC(pty:pla) (Freeman, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/26 9:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/25 6:01 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot1) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/24 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to IHeartMedia, Inc.. (mgr) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report on Copyright (AO-121)
Mon 07/08 5:32 PM
Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (mgr) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 06/21 9:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lynk Media LLC. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18901382), filed by Lynk Media LLC.(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Videos, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Videos, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/24 11:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 06/24 11:43 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) |