Zachary v. Environmental Protection Agency US et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01551 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 354th District Court, Hunt County, Texas, 93534 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:14 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bonny Corporation
PO Drawer B
Bonham, TX 75418 |
|
Defendant
Meridian Housing Company
|
|
Defendant
Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Environmental Protection Agency US
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Estate of H Dean Smith
|
|
Defendant
Estate of Michael D Smith
|
|
Defendant
Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Don Zachary
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Wed 09/11 9:43 AM
Order to Show Cause. Failure to show cause may result in dismissal of Plaintiffs claims without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/11/2024) (kaf) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/11 9:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bonny Corporation, Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Burke, Samuel) (Main Document 30 replaced to flatten on 9/11/2024) (kaf) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 09/09 2:45 PM
Original ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint,, filed by Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc, Bonny Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against Don Zachary filed by Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc, Bonny Corporation (Burke, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/29 11:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting27 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Defendants Voluntary Purchasing Groups, Inc. and Bonny Corporation must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 9, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/29/2024) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/28 11:05 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to file Answer to First Amended Petition(), Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bonny Corporation, Voluntary Purchasing Group IncAttorney Samuel B Burke added to party Bonny Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Burke added to party Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc(pty:dft) (Burke, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
14
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/23 1:20 PM
Special Order No. 3-354: Effective August 23, 2024, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Magistrate Judge Brian McKay and shall henceforth carry the suffix letters BW. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-354. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge David C. Godbey on 8/23/2024) (cea) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 08/19 5:04 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Coffee, Heather) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/19 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Coffee, Heather) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/19 2:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Tue 08/06 11:20 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot18 Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality's Motion to Dismiss and20 Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency's Motion to Dismiss in light of21 Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/6/2024) (chmb) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/05 9:29 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Don Zachary. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Daniel) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/02 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Environmental Protection Agency US with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 07/31 2:59 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality re18 MOTION to Dismiss with separate supporting brief (Coffee, Heather) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/31 2:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with separate supporting brief filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Coffee, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/22 9:45 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/22/2024) (chmb) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/19 12:34 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Coffee, Heather) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/19 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Coffee, Heather) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 12:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Estate of H Dean Smith, Estate of Michael D Smith, Meridian Housing Company. (ykp) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 07/19 11:54 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 07/19 11:53 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Fri 07/19 11:52 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/19 9:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/19/2024) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/18 4:41 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Environmental Protection Agency US with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/28 9:07 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/28/2024) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/27 3:24 PM
MOTION to Extend Time filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality Attorney Heather Coffee added to party Texas Commission on Environmental Quality(pty:dft) (Coffee, Heather) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/27 9:23 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/27/2024) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/26 12:07 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Environmental Protection Agency US with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/26 12:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Environmental Protection Agency US. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Mon 06/24 10:08 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (agc) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Boyle
Fri 06/21 4:41 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/21 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Environmental Protection Agency, US. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Padis-DOJ, George) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Records, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Original Petition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Letter to Clerk, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Request for Docket and Public Filings |