Surface v. Burke
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Referred: | Kathryn A Starnella |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01736 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 3:02 AM MDT |
Defendant
Kelly Ann Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Todd Surface
11480 Kearney Way
Thornton, CO 80233 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/27 3:05 PM
Status Update from Colorado State Court Status Conference by Plaintiff Raymond Todd Surface (sphil, ) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/16 12:37 PM
REPLY to Response to8 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Her Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kelly Ann Burke. (Montville, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/16 12:32 PM
REPLY to Response to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Attorney Christopher P. Montville added to party Kelly Ann Burke(pty:dft) filed by Defendant Kelly Ann Burke. (Montville, Christopher) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 08/06 8:44 AM
RESPONSE to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,8 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Her Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Raymond Todd Surface. (sphil, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Memorandum
Tue 07/23 9:14 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kelly Ann Burke, and8 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Motion to Dismiss filed by Kelly Ann Burke. Motions7 and8 are referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 7/23/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stay
Mon 07/22 5:26 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Her Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Kelly Ann Burke. (McMahon, Jacob) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 07/22 5:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Kelly Ann Burke.(McMahon, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Register of Actions | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Fri 07/12 3:05 PM
Summons Returned Executed upon Kelly Anne Burke on 7/1/2024, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Todd Surface (ccuen, ) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/21 2:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 6/21/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 06/21 11:40 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 11:39 AM
SUMMONS issued over the counter by Clerk. (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 06/21 11:39 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against Kelly Ann Burke Filing Fee: $405.00Receipt Number:110976, filed by Raymond Todd Surface.(efoga, ) |