Durham (PS) v. Ciolli
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis T Babcock |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01728 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241fd - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 08/14 11:21 AM
JUDGMENT by Clerk re:10 Order of Dismissal on 8/14/2024. (ccuen, ) |
|
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/14 11:18 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (ECF No.1 ) is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Mr. Durham failed to cure the deficiencies as directed. IFP on appeal is DENIED. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No.6 ) is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/14/2024. (ccuen, ) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Reply
Mon 07/29 4:52 PM
Applicant's REPLY to the Court's7 Second Order Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Petitioner Jeffery S. Durham. (ccuen, ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Reassigning Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 11:27 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Upon his appointment and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Gurley at the end of the case number (such as 24-cv-01728-RTG). (Text only entry) (blaws) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/05 9:00 AM
SECOND ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 3 July 2024. ORDERED that Applicant shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies in this action as directed in this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the action will be dismissed without further notice if Applicant fails to cure all of the deficiencies as directed in this order within the time allowed. (cmadr, ) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/02 11:17 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Petitioner Jeffery S. Durham.(ccuen, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
misc
Reply
Tue 07/02 11:15 AM
Applicant's REPLY to the Court4 Order Directing Applicant To Cure Deficiencies, by Petitioner Jeffery S. Durham. (ccuen, ) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/24 11:27 AM
ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Applicant cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . Any papers that Applicant files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. If Applicant fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order , the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 6/24/2024. (ccuen, ) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 06/21 9:20 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
14
pgs
misc
Memorandum - General
Fri 06/21 9:19 AM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 re1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jeffery S. Durham. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 06/21 9:16 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Jeffery S. Durham.(efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |