Boyd v. Truist Bank
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Frank D Whitney |
Referred: | David Keesler |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00583 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Truist Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshall Boyd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Marshall Boyd (Ostrow, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/29 1:38 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. Truist Bank answer due 8/21/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/29/24. (mga) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/29 10:12 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Truist Bank. (Springer, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/29 10:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank. (Springer, Brandon) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon C.E. Springer on behalf of Truist Bank (Springer, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/25 2:19 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey M. Ostrow for Marshall Boyd. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/25/24. (mga) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
Thu 07/25 9:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeff Ostrow Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6603552. by Marshall Boyd. (Harris, Scott) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/15 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshall Boyd. Truist Bank served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. (Harris, Scott) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 3:56 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Truist Bank. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/21 1:57 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Marshall Boyd. (Harris, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
57
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Truist Bank with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6566294), filed by Marshall Boyd.(Harris, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/21 3:53 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (add) |
||
utility
Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney
Fri 06/21 3:53 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (add) |