Evans v. Rausch Sturm, LLP
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02408 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rausch Sturm, LLP
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Evans
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/03 5:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 9/3/2024.(RMM) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/21 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Evans(Vavreck, Mark) Modified text on 8/21/2024 (ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 4:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Rausch Sturm, LLP. (ACH) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/12 3:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rausch Sturm, LLP. filed by Jason Evans. Filer requests summons issued. (Vavreck, Mark) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/21 1:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Rausch Sturm, LLP. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/21 1:17 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-2408 (ECT/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Rausch Sturm, LLP (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11144701) filed by Jason Evans. Filer requests summons issued. (Vavreck, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |