Kennedy v. Rochester & Southern Railroad
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00794 |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Cause | 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rochester & Southern Railroad
|
|
Plaintiff
Gerald J. Kennedy, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case
Tue 06/25 1:26 PM
ORDER: that the Clerk of the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York pursuant to Local Rule 3.7 of the Northern District of New York; that the Clerk of this Court advise the clerk of the Western District of New York of the entry of this order and provide all information necessary for the clerk of the Western District of New York to electronically access the documents filed in this action. The Court hereby waives the fourteen (14) day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 3.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/25/2024. (see) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 06/25 1:33 PM
Case transferred electronically to the Western District of New York pursuant to the4 Order. {WDNY was also advised summonses will need to be issued} (see) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 06/25 2:00 PM
Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 6:24-cv-06396, filed 06/25/2024 (nas, ) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter Brief
Mon 06/24 4:49 PM
LETTER BRIEF Consent to Sua Sponte Transfer by Gerald J. Kennedy, Jr. (Santola, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Mon 06/24 10:53 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to show cause in writing, on or before July 1, 2024, why this action should not be sua sponte transferred to the District Court for the Western District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1400(a), 1406(a), because Defendants principal place of business is located there and it appears that the incident alleged in the Complaint took place there. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/24/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Rochester & Southern Railroad (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6774621) filed by Gerald J. Kennedy, Jr.(see) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |