MACK v. HACKETT et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas D Schroeder |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00513 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Thu 08/01 4:19 PM
JUDGMENT as to JAMES DAMION MACK, for the reasons set forth in the Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment, that this action is dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited in the Recommendation. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/1/24. (cb) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/01 4:15 PM
ORDER as to JAMES DAMION MACK, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, that this action be filed, but then dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited in the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/1/24. (cb) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Fri 07/26 9:52 AM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE:2 RECOMMENDED RULING by MAGISTRATE JUDGE re1 Complaint filed by JAMES DAMION MACK. (ae) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 07/25 1:11 PM
Motion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE:4 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (ae) |
||
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Application to Proceed IFP
Mon 07/15 4:06 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed IFP filed by JAMES DAMION MACK.(cb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Mailing Recommendation
Tue 07/02 1:31 PM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 7/19/2024. (cb) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/02 1:09 PM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION as to JAMES DAMION MACK. ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff § 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/2/2024. (cb) |
|
order
Order
Tue 07/02 1:23 PM
ORDER that in forma pauperis status is granted. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/2/24. See2 .(cb) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 06/24 4:14 PM
Case Assigned to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (cb) |
||
utility
Case Referred for Screening
Mon 06/24 4:18 PM
CASE REFERRED for Screening (cb) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JAMES DAMION MACK.(cb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back |