Gentile v. New Orleans City Park Improvement Association et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Greg Gerard Guidry |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01607 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Death) |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
LaToya Cantrell
|
|
Defendant
New Orleans City Park Improvement Association
|
|
Defendant
Susan Hutson
|
|
Defendant
Anne Kirkpatrick
|
|
Defendant
Dwight McKenna
|
|
Plaintiff
Rita Gentile
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 09/03 12:34 PM
ORDER granting20 MOTION to Continue submission date on14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2024. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 9/3/2024.(lag) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Continue
Fri 08/30 11:37 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on McKenna's Motion to Dismiss by Rita Gentile.(Trahant, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/20 4:12 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint as to New Orleans City Park Improvement Association answer due 9/19/2024. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/20/2024. (lag) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/20 4:10 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/20/2024. (lag) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/20 1:34 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint by New Orleans City Park Improvement Association.Attorney Christopher J. Rouse added to party New Orleans City Park Improvement Association(pty:dft).(Rouse, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/20 12:06 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint by Susan Hutson.Attorney Randy George McKee added to party Susan Hutson(pty:dft).(McKee, Randy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/16 5:19 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/16/2024. (lag) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
Fri 08/16 3:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dwight McKenna. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2024.Attorney Lance V. Licciardi, Jr added to party Dwight McKenna(pty:dft).(Licciardi, Lance) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/16 12:20 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by LaToya Cantrell.Attorney Max Victor Camp added to party LaToya Cantrell(pty:dft).(Camp, Max) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/06 3:37 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that, absent an appearance by defendants, New Orleans City Park Improvement Association, Latoya Cantrell, Dwight McKenna or Sheriff Susan Hutson, plaintiff move for entry of default on or before AUGUST 20, 2024, or show cause by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, why these defendants should not be dismissed for plaintiffs failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/6/2024.(lag) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/26 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Trahant, Richard) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/26 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Trahant, Richard) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/26 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rita Gentile served on 7/11/2024, answer due 8/1/2024. (Trahant, Richard) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/26 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rita Gentile served on 7/10/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Trahant, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/26 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to LaToya Cantrell, Susan Hutson, Dwight McKenna, New Orleans City Park Improvement Association.(gla) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Tue 06/25 3:40 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Trahant, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Tue 06/25 3:39 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Trahant, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Tue 06/25 3:38 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Trahant, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Tue 06/25 3:37 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Trahant, Richard) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/21 4:56 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10581587) filed by Rita Gentile.Attorney Richard Charles Trahant added to party Rita Gentile(pty:pla).(Trahant, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |