Woods v. City of St. Louis, Missouri et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew T Schelp |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00868 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Adrian Barnes
|
|
Defendant
Vernon Betts
Sheriff's Office 10 N. Tucker Blvd. 8th Floor
St. Louis, MO 63101 |
|
Defendant
Jeff Carson
|
|
Defendant
City of St. Louis, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Clemmons-Abdullah
|
|
Defendant
Corizon Health
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Missouri State Public Defender St. Louis Trial Office
|
|
Defendant
Unnamed 22nd Judicial Circuit Judicial Employees
|
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Woods
211 S. Clark #2195
Chicago, IL 60690 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Wed 08/21 11:34 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis' Consent Motion for Extension of Time, Doc.18 , is GRANTED. Defendant shall have through September 23, 2024 to file an answer or motion to dismiss in response to Plaintiff's Complaint, Doc.1 . (City of St. Louis, Missouri answer due 9/23/2024.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/21/2024. (TMT) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/19 12:11 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and/or to File Motion to Dismiss re 1 Complaint by Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Duncan, Abby) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 08/19 11:22 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Abby J. Duncan for Defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Duncan, Abby) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Pro Bono Panel Appointment
Tue 08/13 3:56 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Javad M. Khazaeli, Khazaeli Wyrsch, LLC, 911 Washington Avenue, Suite 211, St. Louis, MO 63101, is appointed to represent Plaintiff Deborah Woods in this civil action. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 12.01(I); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1). The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff's newly appointed counsel with a complete copy of the court file at no cost. (A complete copy of the court file has been emailed to Attorney Sparks) (A copy of this Order has been sent to Plaintiff via USPS and email at debwds2@aol.com) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/13/2024. (TMT) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 08/13 3:51 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw, Doc.11 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set in this matter for August 19, 2024, is CANCELLED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion for Court-Appointed Counsel, Doc.14 , is GRANTED. An Order and Notice of Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel will accompany this Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/13/2024. (TMT) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 08/08 3:45 PM
MOTION For New Court-Appointed Counsel by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (KXS) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/07 5:42 PM
NOTICE Certificate of Service: by Plaintiff Deborah Woods re12 Order,, (Sparks, Paige) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Wed 08/07 1:12 PM
ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing will be held on Attorney Paige Sparks's Motion to Withdraw, Doc.11 , on Monday, August 19, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 16-South of the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Attorney Sparks shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via both electronic mail and physical mail, and Attorney Sparks shall file a Certificate of Service upon doing so. ( Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 08/07/2024. (KCD) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney/Firm
Tue 07/30 6:20 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Paige Sparks - Sparks Law Firm by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (Sparks, Paige) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pro Bono Panel Appointment
Wed 07/03 12:59 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Paige M. Sparks, Sparks Law LLC, 2025 Zumbehl Road, # 102, Saint Charles, MO 63303, is appointed to represent Plaintiff Deborah Woods in this civil action. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 12.01(I); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1). The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff's newly appointed counsel with a complete copy of the court file at no cost. (A complete copy of the court file has been emailed to Attorney Sparks) (A copy of this Order has been sent to Plaintiff via USPS and email at debwds2@aol.com) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 7/3/2024. (TMT) Modified on 7/3/2024 (TMT) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 06/25 3:33 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Tue Jun 25 15:33:17 CDT 2024 (Davis, Kinica) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
City Waiver Letter
Tue 06/25 3:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE LETTER from clerk to St. Louis City Counselors Office As to Defendants: City of St. Louis.(KCD) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 06/24 2:59 PM
ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Doc.2 , is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). The Clerk of Court shall issue process in this matter as to Defendant City of St. Louis and cause such process to be served. See id. at § 1915(d); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Doc.3 , is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1); see also Patterson v. Kelley, 902 F.3d 845, 850 (8th Cir. 2018) (providing criteria for determining whether counsel should be appointed). The Clerk of Court is directed to appoint counsel for Plaintiff in this matter pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. A separate Notice of Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel shall be entered by the Clerk. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regular mail and via electronic mail to the addresses Plaintiff provided in her Complaint. (A copy of this order emailed and mailed through USPS to plaintiff on this day.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 06/24/2024. (KCD) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 06/24 2:59 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mon Jun 24 14:59:40 CDT 2024 (Davis, Kinica) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/21 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiff Deborah Woods re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing is requested for July 8, 2024. (JWD) |
|
6 | 6
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 06/21 2:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing is requested for July 8, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Deborah Woods.(JWD) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Irreparable Injuries, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit D - MSPD STL Legal Failures in Plaintiff's Underlying Case, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit E - Confidential Witness Statement | ||
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 06/21 2:52 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing is requested for July 8, 2024 by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (JWD) |
|
4 | 4
motion
File in Excess of Page Limitation
Fri 06/21 2:51 PM
MOTION To Exceed Word Length by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (JWD) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 06/21 2:50 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (JWD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/21 2:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Deborah Woods. (JWD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/21 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant City of St. Louis, Missouri, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Deborah Woods.(JWD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Fri 06/21 3:12 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Fri 06/21 3:16 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Fri 06/21 4:03 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jun 21 16:03:12 CDT 2024 (admin,) |