Lussier v. Commissioner of Social Security
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Kate Vaughan |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-05492 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
SKV-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order (FORM)
Fri 08/23 3:38 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 9/23/2024, Responsive Brief due by 10/23/2024, Reply Brief due by 11/6/2024, NOTE : The Responsive Brief is due by the above date, or within 30 days of the date the opening is filed, whichever is earlier. The Reply Brief is due by the above date, or within 14 days of the date the response is filed, by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (, ) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/23 7:45 AM
ANSWER to4 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Highland, Erin) |
|
7 | 7
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Fri 08/23 7:05 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Highland, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part4 | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/28 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin Highland on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Highland, Erin) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
SS Notice re FRCP Supplemental Rule 3
Mon 06/24 3:51 PM
Notice : Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), Rule 3. Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." (AQ) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security filed by Joann L Lussier. (AQ) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/24 3:46 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (AQ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/24 12:27 PM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (AQ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/24 12:23 PM
Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (TE) |
||
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/21 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Joann L Lussier.(Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |