Savile Row Land & Title LLC
Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Sarah A Hall |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-11724 |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Debtor
Savile Row Land & Title LLC
16224 Muirfield Pl
Edmond, OK 73013-9790 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Douglas N. Gould
5500 N. Western Ave., Ste 150
Oklahoma City, OK 73118 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Trustee 215 Dean A. McGee Ave., 4th Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
Docket last updated: 06/22/2024 12:05 AM CDT |
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
(auto) Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 06/21 7:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-11724 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A9375835. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
(auto) Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 06/21 6:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 338 . Filed by Savile Row Land & Title LLC Corporate Ownership Statement due 06/21/2024. (Martin, Marty) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 06/21 7:04 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Filed by Marty D Martin on behalf of Savile Row Land & Title LLC. (Martin, Marty) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor - Form 2030
Fri 06/21 7:05 PM
Amended Disclosure of Compensation of ATTORNEY, Attorney for Debtor - Form 2030 Filed by Marty D Martin on behalf of Savile Row Land & Title LLC. (Martin, Marty) |
|
4 | 4
court
(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Fri 06/21 9:19 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Gould, Douglas N. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/24/2024 via 10:00 AM via Zoom.us/join - Gould: Meeting ID 607 676 7563, Passcode 4435397827, Phone 1-405-296-0228. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |