Vermont District Court
Judge:William K Sessions III
Case #: 2:24-cv-00685
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 4:36 AM EST
Defendant
Tracy B. Collins
Secretary, in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
J. Catherine Connors
in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Ferguson
Vice Chair, in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John P. Gause
Esq., in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Melissa K. Hansen
Executive Director, in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John David Kennedy
Ret. J., in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Christopher K. MacLean
Chair, in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Maine Board of Bar Examiners
and Members in Their Individual and Official Capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Paul H. Mills
Esq., in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Alison E. Tozier
Esq., in individual and official capacities P.O. Box 140
Augusta, ME 04331
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Andrew F. Wisch
Represented By
Paul E. Suitter, Esq.
Office Of The Maine Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Grundstein
J.D. 18 Griggs Road
Morrisville, VT 05661


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 10/07 10:29 PM
REPLY to Response to2 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tracy B. Collins, J. Catherine Connors, Jennifer Ferguson, John P. Gause, Melissa K. Hansen, John David Kennedy, Christopher K. MacLean, Maine Board of Bar Examiners, Paul H. Mills, Alison E. Tozier, Andrew F. Wisch. (Suitter, Paul)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 22, 2024
3 3 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sun 09/22 6:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert Grundstein. (Grundstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 motion Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/06 3:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tracy B. Collins, J. Catherine Connors, Jennifer Ferguson, John P. Gause, Melissa K. Hansen, John David Kennedy, Christopher K. MacLean, Maine Board of Bar Examiners, Paul H. Mills, Alison E. Tozier, Andrew F. Wisch(Suitter, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A. Maine Supreme Judicial Court Order Denying Requests for Relief,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B. Maine Supreme Judicial Court Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Friday, June 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 06/23 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Tracy B. Collins, J. Catherine Connors, Jennifer Ferguson, John P. Gause, Melissa K. Hansen, John David Kennedy, Christopher K. MacLean, Maine Board of Bar Examiners, Paul H. Mills, Alison E. Tozier, Andrew F. Wisch filed by Robert Grundstein.(law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet