Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Prime Hydration LLC
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg N Stivers |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00374 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Prime Hydration LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency
Mon 08/26 11:00 AM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Herbert Finn re17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/13/2024. (KJA) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/08 3:06 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/8/2024 granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for PHV Atty. Herbert H. Finn. cc: Counsel (KDY) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency
Wed 08/07 4:08 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Nicholas J. Sullivan re11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/23/2024. (KJA) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency
Wed 08/07 4:05 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Gregory L. Hillyer re10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/23/2024. (KJA) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/07 9:19 AM
MOTION for Herbert H. Finn to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4082151. by Defendant Prime Hydration LLC (Robinson, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency
Mon 07/22 2:17 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Herbert H. Finn re12 Waiver of Service Executed.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/9/2024. (KJA) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/17 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Prime Hydration LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (Theuerkauf, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 1:31 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 07/12/2024 granting9 Motion for Nicholas J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 1:28 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 07/12/2024 granting8 Motion for Gregory L. Hillyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/11 2:00 PM
MOTION for Nicholas J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4066325. by Plaintiff Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Theuerkauf, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/11 1:56 PM
MOTION for Gregory L. Hillyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4066324. by Plaintiff Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Theuerkauf, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency
Mon 06/24 11:56 AM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Nicholas J. Sullivan re1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/18/2024. (KJA) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency
Mon 06/24 11:54 AM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Gregory L. Hillyer re1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/18/2024. (KJA) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - US Patent & Trademark
Mon 06/24 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Filing or Determination re:Patent or Trademark re1 Complaint, (DJT) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/24 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Prime Hydration LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assignment
Mon 06/24 9:44 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DJT) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1))
Mon 06/24 9:43 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (DJT) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Prime Hydration LLC Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-4055222, filed by Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (DJT) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - TM Registration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Prime Nutrition Products, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Prime Nutrition Products, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Prime Nutrition Products, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Prime Hydration Products, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Prime Hydration Products |