Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:24-cv-01751
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 - Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 3:05 AM MST
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Represented By
Brad E. Leneis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By
Brad E. Leneis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Brad E. Leneis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Meng Xu
[E-filer effective 6/24/2024] 2613 Redcliff Drive
Broomfield, CO 80023


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Mon 02/24 2:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to ECF22 on 24 February 2025. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 02/24 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Meng Xu (Xu, Meng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 01/28 2:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants must answer or otherwise respond to1 Complaint on or before 2/28/2025.18 Motion for Extension of time is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/28/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 01/24 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint until February 28, 2025, by Defendants US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht. (Leneis, Brad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 10:08 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint until February 7, 2025, filed by Plaintiff Meng Xu. (Xu, Meng)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 01/17 11:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint until February 7, 2025, by Defendants US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht. (Leneis, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Mon 01/06 11:30 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-01751-DDD-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
16 16 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/03 10:28 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 10/2/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
15 15 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/19 3:56 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 8/19/2024. Status Conference set for October 2, 2024, at 10:30 a.m., before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty in Courtroom A501 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. The Court extends Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the1 Complaint to October 2, 2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
14 14 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 08/06 1:38 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/6/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Reassigning Case Tue 08/06 8:22 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-1751-DDD . (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Minute Order Tue 08/06 8:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the consent form filed by the Parties declining consent under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) [ECF11 ], the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 08/05 2:30 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, US Citizenship and Immigration Services All parties do not consent.. (Leneis, Brad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
10 10 order Minute Order Wed 07/24 2:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 8/12/2024 . Status Conference set for 8/19/2024 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/24/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 10:46 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/24/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 07/24 10:39 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 07/24 10:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the court sua sponte. This case has been assigned to the AP docket in error. This case does not fall within the scope of cases subject to management as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c) governing cases challenging an action or final decision of an administrative agency. The shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Case randomly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/24/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 07/09 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad E. Leneis on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, US Citizenship and Immigration ServicesAttorney Brad E. Leneis added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Brad E. Leneis added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Brad E. Leneis added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft) (Leneis, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 07/01 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meng Xu. All Defendants. (Xu, Meng)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 06/24 10:15 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Mon 06/24 10:12 AM
SUMMONS issued over the counter by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 06/24 10:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/24 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, Andrew Lambrecht, US Citizenship and Immigration Services Filing Fee: $405.00Receipt Number:110981, filed by Meng Xu.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet