GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. CRAWFORD et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta C Biggs |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00515 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 7:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
MATTHEW Z. BERKY
|
|
Defendant
SETH R. BERKY
|
|
Defendant
PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HANNAH B. DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
MAGGIE B. DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
BRANDY B. SHEWCOW
|
|
Plaintiff
GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Crossclaim
Wed 09/11 4:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Peter Berky, First CROSSCLAIM against PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD by MATTHEW Z. BERKY, HANNAH B. DAVIS, MAGGIE B. DAVIS, SETH R. BERKY, BRANDY B. SHEWCOW. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/10 7:25 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim for GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. Answer due by 10/2/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 9/10/2024. (jsb) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 09/09 1:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(CROW, NIKOLE) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 09/05 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MATTHEW B. TYNAN on behalf of Defendant PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD (TYNAN, MATTHEW) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/28 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEARNS DAVIS on behalf of Defendant PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD (DAVIS, KEARNS) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 08/28 4:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, in Interpleader , Counterclaim against by PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD.(COLSTON, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Removing Administrator, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letters Testamentary to Patricia Cox Crawford | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 08/13 11:17 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by Defendants MATTHEW Z. BERKY, SETH R. BERKY, HANNAH B. DAVIS, MAGGIE B. DAVIS, BRANDY B. SHEWCOW on 07 13-2024 SANDERS, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Davis, Hannah Waiver, | ||
Att: 2 Davis, Maggie Waiver, | ||
Att: 3 Berky, Matthew Waiver, | ||
Att: 4 Berky, Seth Waiver | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/18 9:07 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD. Answer due by 8/28/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/18/2024. (jsb) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/17 5:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement. (COLSTON, DANIEL) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/17 5:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD.(COLSTON, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/17 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DANIEL L. COLSTON on behalf of Defendant PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD (COLSTON, DANIEL) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/08 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY as to PATRICIA COX CRAWFORD served on 7/7/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. on process server Patricia Cox Crawford (CROW, NIKOLE) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Right to Consent
Tue 06/25 3:09 PM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties.. (cc) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Jurisdiction | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/25 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.. (cc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons issued to SETH R. BERKY, Individually, | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued to SETH R. BERKY, as Administrator for Estate of ZOLTAN TIBOR BERKY, | ||
Att: 3 Summons issued to BRANDY B. SHEWCOW, | ||
Att: 4 Summons issued to MATTHEW Z. BERKY, | ||
Att: 5 Summons issued to HANNAH B. DAVIS, | ||
Att: 6 Summons issued to MAGGIE B. DAVIS | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 06/25 8:39 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (cc) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 06/25 8:39 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (cc) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/24 2:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent GENWORTH LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent GENWORTH FINANCIAL, INC., Corporate Parent Genworth North America Corp., Corporate Parent Genworth Holdings, Inc. for GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HAYNES, SONNY) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2024 with flattened document.) (sh) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Special Appearance
Mon 06/24 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney NIKOLE M. CROW on behalf of InterPleader-Plaintiff GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3858405.) (CROW, NIKOLE) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/24 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SONNY S. HAYNES on behalf of InterPleader-Plaintiff GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY (HAYNES, SONNY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Matthew Z. Berky, Seth R. Berky(Individually), Seth R. Berky(Administrator for Estate of Zoltan Tibor Berky), Patricia Cox Crawford, Hannah B. Davis, Maggie B. Davis, Brandy B. Shewcow ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3858293.), filed by GENWORTH LIFE AND ANNUITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(HAYNES, SONNY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy of Insurance, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B - Beneficiary Designation 7 16-2019 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 7 29-2019 Letter, | ||
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit D - Beneficiary Designation 10 14-2021 | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E - 10 19-2021 Letter, | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit F - Death Certificate, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 1 18-2024 Letter, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 1 21-2024 Letter, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 1 24-2024 Letter, | ||
Att: 10 5 pgs Exhibit J - 5 10-2024 Letter to Patricia Crawford, | ||
Att: 11 13 pgs Exhibit K - Medical Examiner Report, | ||
Att: 12 4 pgs Exhibit L - Proof of Loss, | ||
Att: 13 4 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |