Pernell v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Solomon Oliver, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01054 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
475 Anton Blvd.
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittney Pernell
7658 Slate Ridge Blvd.
Reynoldsburg, OH 43068 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 09/09 10:56 AM
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 10/21/2024 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel separately. (D,JJ) |
||
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement
Fri 09/06 8:46 AM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference held on 9/4/2024. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 10/11/2024. Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2025. The court hereby refers the case to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd to conduct a mediation session as soon as possible after 1/15/2025. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/6/2024. Time: 30 minutes (R,Sh) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event)
Thu 08/29 3:28 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Huse, William) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Fri 08/16 12:52 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's17 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 9/16/2023 to answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/16/2024. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/16/2024. (R,Sh) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Thu 08/15 3:40 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 9/16/2023 to answer filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Wallace, David) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Mon 08/12 12:29 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh) |
|
15 | 15
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Mon 08/12 12:26 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/4/2024 at 02:30 PM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately.Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/12/2024. (R,Sh) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/06 9:40 AM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dunnett, Caitlin) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/18 5:11 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Huse, William) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Thu 07/18 11:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Huse, William) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Attorney Appearance (atty event)
Thu 07/18 11:07 AM
Attorney Appearance by William M. Huse filed by on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Huse, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Wed 07/17 8:32 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/16/2024 to answer filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Wallace, David) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Attorney Appearance (atty event)
Wed 07/17 8:30 AM
Attorney Appearance by David A. Wallace filed by on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Wallace, David) |
|
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Wed 07/17 8:48 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/16/2024 to answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/16/2024. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/17/2024.(R,Sh) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Mon 07/15 11:34 AM
Motion for extension of time until August 7, 2024 to answer filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dunnett, Caitlin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event)
Mon 07/15 11:32 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dunnett, Caitlin) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance (atty event)
Mon 07/15 11:27 AM
Attorney Appearance by Caitlin M. Dunnett filed by on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dunnett, Caitlin) |
|
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Mon 07/15 3:56 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's8 Motion for extension of time until August 7, 2024 to answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/7/2024. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/15/2024.(R,Sh) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 07/02 12:05 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Trans Union, LLC on 6/27/2024, filed on behalf of Brittney Pernell Related document(s)1 . (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 07/01 10:04 AM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Equifax Information Services, LLC on 6/26/2024, filed on behalf of Brittney Pernell (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/28 11:26 AM
Motion for attorney Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12625169, filed by Plaintiff Brittney Pernell.(Hilton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 06/28 4:24 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Yitzchak Zelman for Brittney Pernell. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/28/2024.(R,Sh) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Mon 06/24 2:05 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (F,AW) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 11:31 AM
Civil Action Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $405.00, receipt number AOHNDC-12615771. Filed by Brittney Pernell. (Hilton, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 06/24 1:49 PM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (F,AW) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/24 1:49 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW) |