Sundlof v. National Visa Center et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Charlotte N Sweeney |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01755 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 05:0701 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference
Tue 08/27 11:25 AM
ORDER denying6 First Motion for Hearing/Conference. The Court denies the motion as premature. It is not clear from the docket if Plaintiff has served the Defendants. Plaintiff shall advise the Court when service has been effectuated. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 8/27/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Hearing/Conference
Wed 07/31 12:50 PM
First MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Plaintiff John Sundlof. (Ortiz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 07/12 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/12/2024. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All further proceedings should be designated as 24-cv-01755-CNS . (schap, ) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Administrative Notice
Thu 06/27 10:13 AM
Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (ykare, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 06/26 8:58 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (ykare, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 06/26 8:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (ykare, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 7:28 AM
COMPLAINT Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by John Robert Sundlof against U.S. Department of State/National Visa Center (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9748247)Attorney Daniel Joseph Ortiz, II added to party John Robert Sundlof(pty:pla), filed by John Robert Sundlof.(Ortiz, Daniel) |