Snell-Jones v. G.D.C. et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | Benjamin W Cheesbro |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00034 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/03 2:04 PM
ORDERED that the the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send Plaintiff a copy of this Order, a copy of the attached form, and the Courts prior Order, doc.8 . Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to complete and return his consent form to the Court, along with his Amended Complaint. (Compliance due by 9/17/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/3/24. (wwp) Modified on 9/3/2024 (wwp) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 08/14 12:30 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Zion Snell-Jones. (loh) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 4:19 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 8/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/23/2024. (maa) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 11:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zion Snell-Jones. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/03 3:21 PM
ORDER denying re4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to provide a blank copy of a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form for use by prisoner-plaintiffs to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised he is to complete this blank form in full within 14 days of this Order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will also result in the dismissal of his cause of action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/3/24. (loh) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/03 3:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 7/17/2024. (loh) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Tue 06/25 11:03 AM
DECLARATION in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, by Zion Snell-Jones. (jlh) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 06/25 10:56 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Zion Snell-Jones. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/24 3:40 PM
Filing Fee Deficiency NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/15/2024. (pts) |
|
Att: 1 AO 240 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 06/24 3:35 PM
Summons Submitted (pts) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zion Snell-Jones.(pts) |