Leubner v. DoorDash Inc et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00535 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Lonoke County Circuit Court, 43CV-24-00439 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
DoorDash Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Entities
|
|
Defendant
Orlando Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Misty Leubner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/22 12:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Misty Leubner. Orlando Long served on 7/12/2024. (Brewer, Anthony) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/01 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Orlando Long and given to counsel for plaintiff. (jap) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/25 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Orlando Long.(Robinson, Jon) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Tue 06/25 11:04 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by DoorDash Inc (Koehler, Jessica) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Deficiency Letter
Tue 06/25 8:02 AM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/24 4:42 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by DoorDash Inc. (ajj) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Misty Leubner. (ajj) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/24 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DoorDash Inc from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-24-439. Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT6866. (ajj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |