Thornsberry v. Perkins et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Referred: | Edie R Ervin |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00538 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Defendant
Brandon Carroll
|
|
Defendant
Brian T Perkins
|
|
Defendant
James Gibson
|
|
Defendant
Justine M Minor
|
|
Defendant
Keith L Waddle
|
|
Defendant
Roosevelt G Barden
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher A Thornsberry
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Order on Partial Report and Recommendations
Wed 09/11 10:36 AM
ORDER adopting9 Magistrate Judge Ervin's partial recommendation; overruling10 Thornsberry's objections; dismissing, without prejudice, Thornsberry's harassment claim against Sergeant Perkins and his due process claims against Officer Waddle and Hearing Judge Minor; instructing the Clerk to terminate Officer Waddle and Hearing Judge Minor as defendants; and allowing Thornsberry's retaliation claim against Sergeant Perkins and deliberate indifference claims against Sergeant Perkins, Major Barden, Warden Gibson, and Deputy Warden Carroll to go forward. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 09/11/2024. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/28 3:36 PM
EXHIBITS by Christopher A Thornsberry. (llg) |
|
10 | 10
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/28 3:15 PM
OBJECTIONS to9 Partial Recommended Disposition by Christopher A Thornsberry. (llg) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Partial Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/15 4:41 PM
PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Mr. Thornsberry's verbal harassment claim against Defendant Perkins and his due process claim against Defendants Waddle and Minor be dismissed, without prejudice; and the Clerk be instructed to terminate Keith L. Waddle and Justine M. Minor as party Defendants. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 08/15/2024. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/15 3:47 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Brian T. Perkins, Major Roosevelt Barden, Warden James Gibson, and Deputy Warden Brandon Carroll; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve each of these Defendants with a summons and a copy of2 complaint and7 amended complaint (with any attachments), without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 08/15/2024. (llg) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/15 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Brian T Perkins, Roosevelt G Barden, James Gibson, and Brandon Carroll and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (llg) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 08/09 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re7 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christopher A Thornsberry". (jak) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/08 3:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Christopher A Thornsberry, filed by Christopher A Thornsberry. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 07/16 11:28 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting5 Motion to Extend Time. Mr. Thornsberry may have until August 30, 2024, to file his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 07/16/2024. (smp) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time
Tue 07/16 10:37 AM
MOTION Requesting Time Extension by Christopher A Thornsberry. (llg) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
7
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/26 11:25 AM
ORDER allowing Mr. Thornsberry to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order; and instructing the Clerk to provide Mr. Thornsberry a blank 1983 complaint form, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 6/26/2024. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 06/25 3:12 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the appropriate ADC offices; and the Warden of the Varner Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 06/25/2024. (llg) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christopher A Thornsberry. (llg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/24 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher A Thornsberry. (llg) |