Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.149.168.104
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Terry J Hatter, Jr |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05321 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.149.168.104
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Leave re Discovery Matter
Thu 07/18 3:05 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting10 Ex Parte Application for Leave. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on Spectrum to obtain the Doe defendant's true name and address. The subpoena must include a copy of this order. (See document for further details.) (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave re Discovery Matter
Tue 07/16 6:36 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Tue 06/25 11:39 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, all related Strike 3 Holdings, LLC cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The Related Group Control Number is 5:18-cv-00787-TJH-(SPx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 06/25 11:30 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 06/25 11:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 06/25 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 06/24 6:28 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/24 6:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/24 6:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 06/24 6:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/24 6:23 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37712855 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |