Kamaka Partners LLC v. Iron Eagle, Inc.
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Jill A Otake |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00265 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 1:02 AM HST |
Defendant
John Gravener
|
|
Defendant
Iron Eagle, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
James Petrides
|
|
Plaintiff
Kamaka Air LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kamaka Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kamaka Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/06 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Ken Gile, Erick Nodland. (jni) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
service
Summons (Proposed)
Wed 09/04 2:21 PM
Summons (Proposed) (Shinyama, Ross) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
72 | 72
service
Summons (Proposed)
Tue 09/03 6:49 PM
Summons (Proposed) (Shinyama, Ross) |
|
71 | 71
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 09/03 6:42 PM
Iron Eagle, James Petrides, & John Gravener's ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Erick Nodland, Ken Gile, COUNTERCLAIM against Kamaka Air LLC, Kamaka Holdings LLC, Kamaka Partners LLC by James Petrides, John Gravener, Iron Eagle, Inc..(Shinyama, Ross) |
|
Att: 1 Counterclaim, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Third-Party Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Demand for Jury Trial, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service |