Abdullah v. Florida Blue/Guidewell
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01505 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2003 Job Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Florida Blue/Guidewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nefertiti Abdullah
3650 Lefays Point
Land O Lakes, FL 34638 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 08/15 1:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Florida Blue/Guidewell. (Aidman, Todd) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/01 1:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before August 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/1/2024. (AC) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 07/31 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesica Fico on behalf of Florida Blue/Guidewell (Fico, Jesica) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 07/31 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Todd Sidney Aidman on behalf of Florida Blue/Guidewell. Lead Counsel: Todd S. Aidman. (Aidman, Todd) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Wed 07/31 6:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Florida Blue/Guidewell. (Aidman, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Tue 07/09 12:30 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc. (c/o Chief Financial Officer). (LD) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Mon 06/24 12:45 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Florida Blue/Guidewell. (LD) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/24 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Florida Blue/Guidewell Filing fee $405.00, receipt number TPA70623 filed by Nefertiti Abdullah.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |