ZHENG et al v. MAYORKAS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01827 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
MERRICK B. GARLAND
|
|
Defendant
UR MENDOZA JADDOU
|
|
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
|
|
Plaintiff
LUNING WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAPHAEL WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RUIQI WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YIGE WANG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAN ZHENG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 08/28 4:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR MENDOZA JADDOU served on 7/1/2024; ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 7/1/2024 (Jeelani, Hashim) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Wed 08/28 4:21 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2024. (Jeelani, Hashim) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 08/28 4:19 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/02/2024. (Jeelani, Hashim) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Stayed
Fri 08/23 2:19 PM
Case Stayed. (zcll) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Stay
Thu 08/22 1:29 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS. |
|
order
Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/22 4:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING3 Defendants' Consent Motion to Temporarily Stay Proceedings. This case is hereby STAYED through October 25, 2024. On or before October 25, 2024, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court on the progress of the Plaintiffs' petitions and, if necessary, propose a schedule to govern further proceedings of this case. To the extent the parties seek a change in the status quo, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 08/22/2024. (lcd) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 06/25 1:59 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General MERRICK B. GARLAND,UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, and the U.S. Attorney.(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 1:52 AM
COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10981395) filed by LUNING WANG, RUIQI WANG, RAPHAEL WANG, RAN ZHENG, YIGE WANG.(Ahmed, Sadaf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, | ||
Att: 2 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, | ||
Att: 3 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL, | ||
Att: 4 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, | ||
Att: 5 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR M. JADDOU, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/25 1:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmtm) |