Lawyers for Civil Rights v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11620 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Citizen and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
245 Murray Lane, SW
Washington, DC 20528 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawyers for Civil Rights
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/11 7:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Fixsen on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Fixsen, Alyssa) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed for FOIA
Tue 09/10 8:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Fixsen, Alyssa) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed for FOIA
Tue 09/10 8:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Fixsen, Alyssa) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/31 1:00 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. United States Citizen and Immigration Services and United States Department of Homeland Security answers due September 16, 2024. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/30 5:19 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2024 to File Answer re1 Complaint, by United States Citizen and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Sady, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of United States Citizen and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Sady, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/26 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mirian Albert on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Albert, Mirian) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/25 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Martin, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 06/25 1:02 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against United States Citizen and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10477191 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lawyers for Civil Rights.(Albert, Mirian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |