Everard et al v. CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00342 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS
101 N. College St
Killeen, TX 76541 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kent Cagle
in his official capacity 101 N. College St.
Killeen, TX 76541 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nina Cobb
in her official capacity 101 N. College St.
Killeen, TX 76541 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex Gearhart
in her official capacity Killeen Police Department 3304 Community Blvd
Killeen, TX 76542 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Debbie Nash-King
in her official capacity 101 N. College St.
Killeen, TX 76541 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ken Wilkerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mellisa Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camron Cochran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Everard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fornino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anca Neagu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Surreply to Motion
Wed 09/18 10:23 PM
Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Mellisa Brown, Camron Cochran, James Everard, Michael Fornino, Anca Neagu, re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Defendant Kent Cagle, Defendant Nina Cobb, Defendant Debbie Nash-King, Defendant Ken Wilkerson, Defendant Alex Gearhart (Grisham, CJ) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 09/18 4:31 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Kent Cagle, Nina Cobb, Alex Gearhart, Debbie Nash-King, Ken Wilkerson, re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Defendant Kent Cagle, Defendant Nina Cobb, Defendant Debbie Nash-King, Defendant Ken Wilkerson, Defendant Alex Gearhart (Barrett, Roy) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/06 4:40 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mellisa Brown, Camron Cochran, James Everard, Michael Fornino, Anca Neagu, re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Defendant Kent Cagle, Defendant Nina Cobb, Defendant Debbie Nash-King, Defendant Ken Wilkerson, Defendant Alex Gearhart (Grisham, CJ) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/22 5:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS, Kent Cagle, Nina Cobb, Alex Gearhart, Debbie Nash-King, Ken Wilkerson.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Rivera, Joe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nina Cobb as to Nina Cobb. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Barrett, Roy) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kent Cagle as to Kent Cagle. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Barrett, Roy) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ken Wilkerson as to Ken Wilkerson. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Barrett, Roy) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debbie Nash-King as to Debbie Nash-King. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Barrett, Roy) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS as to CITY OF KILLEEN, TEXAS. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Barrett, Roy) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/24 4:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex Gearhart as to Alex Gearhart. Waiver sent on 6/25/2024, answer due 8/2/2024. (Barrett, Roy) Modified on 7/24/2024 to correct answer due date (cav) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice
Wed 07/03 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Vacation by Mellisa Brown, Camron Cochran, James Everard, Michael Fornino, Anca Neagu (Grisham, CJ) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18913216). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Michael Fornino, Anca Neagu, Mellisa Brown, James Everard, Camron Cochran.(Grisham, CJ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/25 1:16 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cav) |
||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Tue 06/25 1:17 PM
All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing and shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (cav) |