Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01158 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/06 10:13 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 8/6/2024. (MLS) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/17 10:03 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jorge Arco, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Subpoena | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 2:08 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Copyright Report
Wed 06/26 11:09 AM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (AJS) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 06/26 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/26/2024. (MEH) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/26 10:09 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/26/2024. (MEH) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 06/26 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christian W. Waugh on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Lead Counsel: Christian W. Waugh. (Waugh, Christian) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 06/25 3:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Christian W. Waugh of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/25 3:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-1158-CEM-RMN. (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 06/25 1:24 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): No (Waugh, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22232408) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log |