Grama v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kyle C Dudek |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01526 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Social security transcript
Mon 08/26 2:17 PM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rogers, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/26 2:12 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rogers, Kristin) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 08/26 2:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): No (Rogers, Kristin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of substitution of AUSA
Mon 08/26 2:06 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Kristin Rogers substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Rogers, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 07/03 10:07 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 7/3/2024. (CGW) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/02 12:41 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 8:24-cv-1526-KCD. Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn no longer assigned to the case. (NAS) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 06/25 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Carol Ann Avard on behalf of Amber L. Grama. Lead Counsel: Carol Avard. (Avard, Carol) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 06/25 3:17 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Amber L. Grama. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/25 3:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amber L. Grama. (Avard, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/25 2:07 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-1526-SPF. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22232107). The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Amber L. Grama.(Avard, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |