Moore v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00594 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Nelnet Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shakisha Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
9
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Tue 08/27 4:58 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than September 10, 2024. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before September 24, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/27/2024) (saw) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/22 3:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Neff, Sabrina) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/22 12:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Greene, Jibril) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/24 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Local Rule 83.10 filed by Shakisha Moore (Jaffer, Shawn) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 12:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Stein, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/17 9:42 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Extend Time and12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court EXTENDS the deadlines for both Defendants to answer or otherwise responds to August 22, 2024. Additionally, Plaintiff and Defendant Nelnet are ORDERED to read and comply with LocalRule 83.10 by no later than July 24, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/17/2024) (chmb) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/17 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Javon Louis Johnson on behalf of Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, Javon) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Amended Document
Wed 07/17 12:10 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Shakisha Moore. Amendment to14 Response/Objection. [14-1] Exhibit A . (Findsen, Beth) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Reply
Wed 07/17 11:23 AM
REPLY filed by Nelnet Servicing, LLC re:14 Response/Objection,12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Neff, Sabrina) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 07/16 7:28 PM
RESPONSE filed by Shakisha Moore re:8 MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Findsen, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A. Email Correspondence | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 07/16 2:51 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Nelnet's Opposed Motion for Initial Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.8 ). The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response or, in the alternative, a statement that she is no longer opposed by July 18, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/16/2024) (saw) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/16 2:19 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Greene, Jibril) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Greene, Jibril) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/16 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jibril Ahman Greene on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Greene, Jibril) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/16 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon S Stein for Brandon Stein on behalf of Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Stein, Brandon) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 07/16 9:41 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nelnet Servicing, LLCAttorney Sabrina A Neff added to party Nelnet Servicing, LLC(pty:dft) (Neff, Sabrina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned
Tue 07/09 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 7/2/2024. (Findsen, Beth) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned
Tue 07/09 9:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nelnet Servicing, LLC ; served on 7/1/2024. (Findsen, Beth) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/27 8:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (saw) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Thu 06/27 8:25 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (saw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/25 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shakisha Moore. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Findsen, Beth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Tue 06/25 1:52 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Proposed Summons filed by Shakisha Moore. (Findsen, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC filed by Shakisha Moore. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14719618) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Findsen, Beth) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |