Shive v. White
Colorado District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01769 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:41 AM MDT |
Defendant
Zachary White
2700 W. Pensacola St. Apt. 1818
Tallahassee, FL 32304 |
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Shive
1020 Honey Locust Court
Colorado Springs, CO 80904 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Wed 06/26 10:24 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Pursuant to phone conversation with clerk's office on 06/26/2024, this case is closed as a duplicate case filing. See case no. 1:24-cv-1780. Text Only Entry (blaws) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Administrative Notice
Wed 06/26 8:17 AM
Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 06/25 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Wayne Hamblin on behalf of Matthew ShiveAttorney Matthew Wayne Hamblin added to party Matthew Shive(pty:pla) (Hamblin, Matthew) |