Mata v. Zillow Group, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dana M Sabraw |
Referred: | Valerie E Torres |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01095 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zillow Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Guillermo Mata
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/01 3:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Guillermo Mata, as to Zillow Group, Inc.. (Nazaryan, Ani) (ddf) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/26 8:19 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-18964409.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kingsbury, Timothy) (exs) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/25 11:49 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zillow Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18961797.), filed by Guillermo Mata. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1095-DMS-VET. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (Nazaryan, Ani)(ggv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |