Fields v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry W Ashe |
Referred: | Donna Phillips Currault |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01619 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orleans Parish Civil District Court, 24-04055 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Handlos Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kendall Fields
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/01 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 4/21/2025. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/1/2024.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 3:27 PM
Rule 7.1 Diversity Disclosure Statement by Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Michael Perkins, Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Schmidt, Patrick) Modified text on 7/30/2024 (clc) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Tue 07/30 9:06 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Enroll Attorney Ralph J. Aucoin, Jr as Counsel of Record for Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Michael Perkins and Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 7/29/2024. (clc) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Mon 07/29 1:18 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Michael Perkins, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Schmidt, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 07/09 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2024 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 07/05 9:50 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 Statement ** Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (my) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement
Wed 07/03 10:58 AM
Statement by Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Michael Perkins, Progressive Northern Insurance Company Corporate Disclosure (Schmidt, Patrick) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/03 10:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Michael Perkins, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Schmidt, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Text Order
Wed 06/26 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re1 Notice of Removal. Upon examination of the record, sensitive information was not redacted from the Notice of Removal filed at R. Doc. 1, pursuant to FRCP 5.2. The filing party, upon instruction from the Clerks Office, has redacted and refiled the Notice of Removal at R. Doc. 2. The Court directs the Clerk to mark R. Doc. 1-2,1-3,and 1-4, the documents containing sensitive information, as a private entries viewable to court users only. Counsel must review all future filings to ensure they fully comply with Rule 5.2 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to ensure privacy protection. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe.(clc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 06/26 10:20 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Notice of Removal. This is a duplicate filing of document 2 and will be noted as such. No further action isnecessary. (amj) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 06/26 8:16 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (car) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/25 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Orleans Parish Civil District Court, case number 2024-04055 (Fee previously paid) filed by Michael Perkins, Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Schmidt, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DIS MRI report (redacted), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - LA Pain Specialists report (redacted), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Van Wormer Clinic report (redacted), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Shawn Fulks, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Pleading List of Parties, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Pleading List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 2 - Long Arm Citation to Handlos Enterprises, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 3 - Long Arm Citation to Michael Perkins, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 4 - Citation to Progressive Northern Insurance Company, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit re: Handlos Enterprises service, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit re: Michael Perkins service, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Pleading Verification, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Pleading Certificate of Filing, | ||
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/25 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Orleans Parish Civil District Court, case number 2024-04055 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10586446) filed by Michael Perkins, Handlos Enterprises, LLC, Progressive Northern Insurance Company.Attorney Patrick Rouen Schmidt added to party Handlos Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Rouen Schmidt added to party Michael Perkins(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Rouen Schmidt added to party Progressive Northern Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Schmidt, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DIS MRI report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - LA Pain Specialists report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Van Wormer Clinic report, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Shawn Fulks, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Pleading List of Parties, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Pleading List of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 2 - Long Arm Citation to Handlos Enterprises, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 3 - Long Arm Citation to Michael Perkins, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 4 - Citation to Progressive Northern Insurance Company, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit re: Handlos Enterprises service, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit re: Michael Perkins service, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Pleading Verification, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Pleading Certificate of Filing, | ||
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet |