Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 4:24-cv-00093
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 6:43 AM EST
Defendant
James City County
Represented By
Jeremy David Capps
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
James City County Police Department
Represented By
Jeremy David Capps
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Trenton Rusk
Represented By
William Peyton Akers
Akers & Cleator Law Group, P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 02/25 4:10 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 2/25/25. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 02/24 1:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Settlement Conference held on 2/24/2025. (cdod, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/03 2:18 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings, ECF No. 26, is GRANTED. The case is STAYED until further order of the Court. The defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 14, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Scheduling Order (ECF No. 19) is VACATED, except that the parties shall participate in the February 24, 2025 Settlement Conference as planned. If the case does not settle at that time, the parties are ORDERED to file a status report every 90 days, beginning on May 5, 2025, until the stay is lifted. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker and filed on 2/3/25. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/24 1:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION to Stay filed by James City County, James City County Police Department. (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
26 26 motion Stay Wed 01/22 11:30 AM
MOTION to Stay by Michael Trenton Rusk. (Hamilton, Kassandra)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kassandra L. Hamilton on behalf of Michael Trenton Rusk (Hamilton, Kassandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
24 24 order Settlement Conference Order Tue 12/10 4:16 PM
Settlement Conference Order: Settlement Conference set for February 24, 2025, at 9:30am; Memorandum due by noon on February 20, 2025. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/10/24. (mrees)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/10 9:33 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2025 at 09:30 AM in Newport News Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/21 10:21 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to contact the Magistrate Judge within 10 days to schedule a settlement conference as directed herein. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/21/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
22 22 misc Waiver of Wed 11/20 11:49 AM
Waiver of re14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by James City County, James City County Police Department (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Motion Fri 10/18 5:07 PM
Reply to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by James City County, James City County Police Department. (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Fri 10/11 4:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Michael Trenton Rusk. (Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
19 19 7 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Mon 10/07 3:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference will be held on 4/24/2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Norfolk before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Jury Trial to commence on 5/13/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Newport News before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference to take place not later than one week before the final pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 10/7/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Mon 10/07 9:42 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/03 12:42 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint ,14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Responses due by 10/11/2024. Replies due by 10/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on October 3, 2024. (Miller, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/02 11:58 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Michael Trenton Rusk. (Akers, William)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 10/02 3:33 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Miller.17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (mrees)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Wed 09/18 9:43 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference to be conducted remotely on 10/7/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 9/18/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
15 15 respoth Brief in Support Fri 09/13 4:37 PM
Brief in Support to14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by James City County, James City County Police Department.(Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 09/13 4:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by James City County, James City County Police Department. (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/30 2:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against James City County, James City County Police Department, filed by Michael Trenton Rusk.(mrees)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 08/30 2:14 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's9 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file ECF No. 9-1 on the docket as an Amended Complaint. The5 Motion to Dismiss directed to the original Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 8/30/24. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/27 12:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James City County, James City County Police Department. (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Motion Thu 08/22 5:22 PM
Reply to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ,9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michael Trenton Rusk. (Akers, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Thu 08/22 5:12 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Trenton Rusk.(Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 09, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/09 3:40 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response to defendants' Motion to Dismiss 5 is due by 8/22/2024. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 8/9/2024. (tameub, )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/09 9:47 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Michael Trenton Rusk.(Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Email from opposing council demonstrating a lack of opposition to the proposed extension.
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 respoth Brief in Support Mon 07/29 4:23 PM
Brief in Support to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James City County, James City County Police Department.(Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/29 4:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James City County, James City County Police Department. (Capps, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/12 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Trenton Rusk All Defendants(Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Service for James City County,
Att: 2 Affidavit Service for James City County Police Department
Thursday, June 27, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/27 12:50 PM
Two (2) Summons Issued as to James City County, James City County Police Department, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(mrees)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedure
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 06/26 3:19 PM
Proposed Summons for Complaint by Michael Trenton Rusk(Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Defendant James City County,
Att: 2 Summons for Defendant James City County Police Department
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/25 3:57 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9599553.), filed by Michael Trenton Rusk.(Akers, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter RE: Video Exhibits E & F,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K
misc Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer Tue 06/25 4:24 PM
Case transferred in from Norfolk Division. Case Number 2:24cv403 (epri, )
Related: [-]