Cronus Global, LLC v. Zuru, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05372 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 3:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Zuru, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Cronus Global, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/06 7:54 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Granting Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (30 days or less)30 . Defendant, Zuru Inc. shall have until October 9, 2024 to respond to the Complaint. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 09/03 2:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Zuru, Inc..(Koley, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 08/26 5:16 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number: 2:24-cv-05372-CAS (PDx) is missing from the Complaint caption page. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 08/23 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 06/25/2024, receipt number 37718606), filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC.(West, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Redacted Document Redacted Agency Agreement | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Thu 08/22 11:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING ZURU'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SEAL PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT AND EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT by Judge Christina A. Snyder24 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted version of the Complaint (ECF No. 1) shall be permanently sealed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a redacted version of the Complaint forthwith. (twdb) |
|
26 | 26
cs_rasgn
Transferring Case (CV-29)
Tue 08/20 2:09 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. ORDER case transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05372-CAS-PDx. Signed by Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Judge Christina A. Snyder. (vp) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Mon 08/19 7:41 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Complaint [filed as Docket Entry 1] and Exhibit A thereto under seal24 filed by Defendant Zuru, Inc..(Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Vieira Declaration - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B to Vieira Declaration - Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
24 | 24
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Mon 08/19 7:19 PM
APPLICATION to file document Complaint [filed as Docket Entry 1] and Exhibit A thereto under seal filed by Defendant Zuru, Inc..(Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jean-Paul Ciardullo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Document - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Redacted Document - Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 08/19 4:16 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley M Koley counsel for Defendant Zuru, Inc.. Adding Ashley M. Koley as counsel of record for Zuru Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zuru Inc.. (Attorney Ashley M Koley added to party Zuru, Inc.(pty:dft))(Koley, Ashley) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 08/19 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Zuru, Inc., identifying Zuru Inc.. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/19 4:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Zuru, Inc. identifying Zuru Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 08/19 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jean-Paul Ciardullo counsel for Defendant Zuru, Inc.. Adding Jean-Paul Ciardullo as counsel of record for Zuru Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Zuru Inc.. (Attorney Jean-Paul Ciardullo added to party Zuru, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ciardullo, Jean-Paul) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Mon 08/05 3:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi:ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE17 . Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC, initiated this action for breach of contract, among other claims, against Defendant Zuru Inc. The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff filed a response18 . Having reviewed the response, the Court believes it may exercise diversity jurisdiction over this action and discharges the order to show cause. (lc) Modified on 8/5/2024 (lc) |
|
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response
Sun 08/04 7:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLCto Order to Show Cause,,,17 (West, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Calzada Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mowbray Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 07/22 2:25 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: APPLICATION TO SEAL3 AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court orders the parties to file supplemental briefing demonstrating compelling reasons why the contract should remain under seal. Additionally or alternatively, the parties may propose targeted redactions of provisions of the contract they contend may cause them competitive harm if publicly disclosed. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a written response within 14 days either conceding the Court lacks jurisdiction or adducing additional facts about the parties citizenship. Failure to file a timely and satisfactory response will result in dismissal without further notice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 07/18 4:32 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
15 | 15
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Thu 07/18 4:22 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05372 MCS(PDx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Wed 07/17 3:23 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05372 CAS(PDx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/16 11:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. upon Zuru, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/11/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jean-Paul Ciardullo. (West, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/11 9:27 AM
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Carson M Hinderks APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC, designating Timothy West as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 07/10 2:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carson M. Hinderks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-37806750) filed by plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. (West, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/09 5:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Zuru, Inc.. (shb) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Mon 07/08 2:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. (Gilman, Stacey) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 06/26 10:21 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. (West, Timothy) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/26 6:27 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 06/26 6:23 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 06/26 6:22 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 06/26 6:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave
Tue 06/25 3:10 PM
APPLICATION to for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit A to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. (Gilman, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Stacey R. Gilman in Support of Application to File Exhibit A Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Exhibit A Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Licensing Agency Agreement (Sealed) | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/25 2:20 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC, identifying Kristin Calzada (aka Kristin Prichard). (Gilman, Stacey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/25 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37718606 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Cronus Global, LLC. (Attorney Stacey R Gilman added to party Cronus Global, LLC(pty:pla))(Gilman, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Slip Sheet Pending Leave to File Under Seal |