Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 26, 2024 5:16 PM ChST
Interested Party
U.S. Probation Office
Represented By
U.S. Probation Office
United States Probation Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shawn N. Anderson
Department Of Justice United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Julian Paul Assange (1)
Terminated: 06/26/2024
Represented By
Richard C Miller
Banes Horey Berman & Miller, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/26/2024 6:01 PM ChST
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
COURT Granted3 Letter Request filed by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. Initial Appearance, Arraignment, and Plea Hearing are set for 6/26/2024 at 9:00 AM in the 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Ordered by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/25/2024. (JXP)
Related: [-]
Terminate3 Letter Request. (JXP)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs INFORMATION as to Julian Paul Assange (1) count(s) 1. (JXP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 AMENDED PLEA Agreement. (JXP) Amended Plea Agreement unsealed on 6/26/2024. (JXP)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs LETTER REQUEST filed by USA as to Julian Paul Assange. (JXP)
Related: [-]
4 4 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, filed by Richard C. Miller. (Miller, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Admitting4 Petitioner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/25/2024. (JXP)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs SUMMONS Executed and Returned to the Court on 6/25/2024. (JXP)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs ORDER Re: Media Access on June 26, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/25/2024. (NBS)
Related: [-]