Chiong v. Frontier Communications Parent Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01592 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Frontier Communications Parent Inc
211 E 7th Street, Ste. 620
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joselyn Chiong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order Consolidating Cases
Thu 07/25 5:15 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:24-cv-1421, 3:24-cv-1423, 3:24-cv-1429; 3:24-cv-1435, 3:24-cv-1441, 3:24-cv-1444, 3:24-cv-1468, 3:24-cv-1492, 3:24-cv-1497, 3:24-cv-1501, 3:24-cv-1507, 3:24-cv-1516, 3:24-cv-1517, and 3:24-cv-1592 consolidated with lead case 3:24-cv-1418-L. Member case administratively closed following consolidation. Further docketing should be in lead case 3:24-cv-1418-L. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/25/2024) (axm) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/22 4:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above styled and numbered case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Sam A. Lindsay, before whom a related case with number, 3:24-CV-1418-L, is pending, and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "L." (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/22/2024) (ndt) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 07/18 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Extend Time. Before the Court is Defendant Frontier Communications Parent, Inc.'s Motion for Extension to Comply with Local Rule 83.10. Having considered the Motion, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. Frontier must comply with Local Rule 83.10 by September 5, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/18/2024) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/17 5:02 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Local Rule 83.10 filed by Frontier Communications Parent Inc (Harrell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 07/16 9:24 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Within twenty-one days of this Order, Defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in sanctions being imposed for failure to comply with an order of the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/16/2024) (chmb) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/16 9:21 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to the Complaint due on or before September 3, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/16/2024) (chmb) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/15 4:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Frontier Communications Parent IncAttorney Robert S Harrell added to party Frontier Communications Parent Inc(pty:dft) (Harrell, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/10 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sabrina S. Saieh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/10/2024) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/09 5:03 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14750325) filed by Joselyn Chiong Attorney Sabrina Soraya Saieh added to party Joselyn Chiong(pty:pla) (Saieh, Sabrina) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/09 11:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie A. Casey. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/9/2024) (chmb) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/08 3:29 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14746086) filed by Joselyn Chiong Attorney Stephanie A Casey added to party Joselyn Chiong(pty:pla) (Casey, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/08 8:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Frontier Communications Parent Inc. (kaf) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Wed 07/03 3:15 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Civil Summons filed by Joselyn Chiong. (Kastl, Kristina) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Brown
Wed 06/26 12:56 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/25 6:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joselyn Chiong. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kastl, Kristina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Frontier Communications Parent, Inc. filed by Joselyn Chiong. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14720898) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kastl, Kristina) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |