Byeljck v. Ryvyl Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gonzalo P Curiel |
Referred: | Steve B Chu |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01096 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ryvyl Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
J. Drew Byeljck
7700 Jefferson Circle
Colleysville, TX 76034 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule
Mon 07/08 10:49 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re3 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:23-cv-00185-GPC-SBC. The new case number is 24cv1096 GPC-SBC.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/28/24. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/24.(aas) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Related Case
Mon 07/01 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by J. Drew Byeljck of case(s) 23cv185 GPC-SBC. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aas) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/25 3:54 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv) |
|
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ryvyl Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 154342.), filed by J. Drew Byelick. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1096-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Byelick, J. Drew)(ggv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits to Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope, | ||
Att: 4 Receipt |