Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:24-cv-02761
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 5:40 AM EST
Defendant
Jive/Zomba Group
Defendant
MJJ Productions
Defendant
R. Kelly Publishing
Defendant
Sony/ATV Music Publishing
Plaintiff
Juliette Moon
141 Holcomb Bridge Road Apt 424
Norcross, GA 30071
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Ryan Lance Isenberg
Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Wayne T. Williams
Terminated: 11/22/2024
Represented By
Ryan Lance Isenberg
Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
appeal Appeal Record Certified Mon 03/10 9:54 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,20 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 25-10365 DD. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
22 22 appeal Transcript Order Form Tue 03/04 8:56 AM
TRANSCRIPT Order Form (No Hrgs) re:20 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 25-10365 D. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
misc Appeal Fee Payment Received Thu 02/20 10:03 AM
Appeal Fee Payment Received re:20 Notice of Appeal. $ 605.00, receipt number 100017345. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Mon 03/10 9:53 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of20 Notice of Appeal filed by Juliette Moon. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 25-10365 D. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 02/04 10:53 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order, and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:20 Notice of Appeal. There is no transcript. Appeal fees HAVE NOT been paid. The District Judge is Mark H. Cohen. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 02/04 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to18 Clerk's Judgment and17 Order to Dismiss, by Juliette Moon. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit.(pjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Appeal Fee Letter
Friday, January 03, 2025
19 19 misc A.O. Form 121 Copyright Fri 01/03 11:56 AM
AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bgt) Added corrected document to entry on 1/3/2025 (bgt)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 01/03 11:50 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and Adjudged that the action be DISMISSED as to Defendants Sony Music Entertainment and Wayne Williams and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants Sony/ATV Music Publishing, MJJ Productions, R. Kelly Publishing, and Jive/Zomba Group for failure to effectuate service of process pursuant to Local Rule 41.2(B) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. (bgt)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- Added correct document to entry on 1/3/2025 (bgt)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order to Dismiss Fri 01/03 11:36 AM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants Sony/ATV Music Publishing, MJJ Productions, R. Kelly Publishing, and Jive/Zomba Group for failure to effectuate service of process pursuant to Local Rule 41.2(B) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. As all Defendants have been dismissed from this action, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/3/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/03 11:38 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (bgt)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/03 11:52 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Juliette Moon re17 Order and18 Clerk's Judgment. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 12/06 10:48 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:15 Order to Show Cause filed by Juliette Moon.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Friday, November 22, 2024
15 15 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/22 11:54 AM
ORDER: Defendants Sony Music Entertainment and Wayne Williams' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.6 ) is Granted. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/22/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause Fri 11/22 12:01 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER (found in15 Order). Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this Court should not dismiss this case without prejudice for failure to effectuate service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). A failure to respond to this Order or to show good cause for failure to serve any Defendant within the prescribed time period will result in this Court dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/22/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/22 12:03 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Juliette Moon re Order to Show Cause,15 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/03 1:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Collateral Estoppel, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records, Sony/ATV Music Publishing, Wayne T. Williams. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 08/22 11:30 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS all discovery and discovery-related activities, including the initial disclosures, planning conferences, and joint preliminary report and discovery plan, required by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26 and the Local Rules, until the Court issues a ruling on Defendants' pending motion to dismiss plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/22/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/22 11:31 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Juliette Moon re13 Order on Motion to Stay. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
12 12 service Return of Service Unexecuted Thu 08/22 9:59 AM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Juliette Moon as to Wayne T. Williams. (dgr)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/22 9:57 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Collateral Estoppel, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Juliette Moon. (dgr)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 08/22 9:48 AM
RESPONSE in Support re7 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery filed by Juliette Moon. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 08/19 10:15 AM
Submission of6 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Collateral Estoppel, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and 7 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 08/13 11:11 AM
Clerk's Notation re8 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/31 10:33 AM
NOTICE by Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records, Wayne T. Williams re7 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/30 4:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records, Wayne T. Williams identifying Corporate Parent Sony Group Corp. for Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stay Tue 07/30 4:15 PM
MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines and Discovery by Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records, Wayne T. Williams. (Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 07/30 4:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Based on Collateral Estoppel, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted with Brief In Support by Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records, Sony/ATV Music Publishing, Wayne T. Williams.(Isenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Fri 07/12 3:15 PM
Return of Service Executed by Juliette Moon. Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 07/08 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Sony Music Entertainment (SME) Epic Records and Wayne T. Williams.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Wayne T. Williams
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 06/25 3:05 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/25/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc A.O. Form 121 Copyright Tue 06/25 9:13 AM
AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bmr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 06/25 3:10 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Juliette Moon re3 Order. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/25 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Juliette Moon. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100012451)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet