N. et al v. The Whitesboro Central School District et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mae A D'Agostino |
Referred: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00804 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 American Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 08, 2024 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Whitesboro Board of Education
|
|
Defendant
The Whitesboro Central School District
|
|
Plaintiff
Misha N.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul N.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 09/11 5:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 Motion to Vacate,, filed by The Whitesboro Board of Education, The Whitesboro Central School District.(Miller, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Fri 09/06 3:17 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re15 Memorandum of Law: Redacted copies of Attachments #2 - Exhibit 1 to the Declaration, #3 - Exhibit 2 to the Declaration, #4 - Exhibit 3 to the Declaration, #5 - Exhibit 4 to the Declaration, #6 - Exhibit 5 to the Declaration, and Attachment 9 to Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's affidavit have been uploaded and attached to Dkt. No.15 . The unredacted copies of Exhibits 1-5 to the Declaration and Exhibit 1 to the Plaintiff's Affidavit are now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2. (hmr) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Wed 09/04 10:40 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the15 Memorandum of Law with Exhibits. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. ***Specifically Exhibits 1-5 to the Attorney Declaration contain minor's name along with the last name of plaintiffs. Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Affidavit contains minor's name along with plaintiffs' last name. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/9/2024 (see) |
||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/04 2:42 PM
Set Deadlines as to14 Cross-MOTION to Vacate: Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/11/2024 - A reply brief NOT to exceed 5 pages may be filed. (ban) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/03 2:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Misha N., Paul N.. (de Oliveira, Carlo Alexandre) |
|
15 | 15
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law
Tue 09/03 2:16 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re14 Motion to Vacate,, in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Vacate Default filed by Misha N., Paul N..(de Oliveira, Carlo Alexandre) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 1 | ||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 08/26 4:21 PM
NOTICE by The Whitesboro Board of Education, The Whitesboro Central School District re Notice (Other),11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Whitesboro Central School District et al filed by Misha N., Paul N.. Motion returnable before Judge Mae D'Agostino(Miller, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 9 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Wed 08/21 4:01 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk received a Phone Call from Defense Counsel Lindsey H. Hazelton who stated she inadvertently filed a Stipulation Selecting Mediator in this case that was meant for another civil matter. She stated that Plaintiff's Counsel was aware of this error. Clerk has deleted the entry "Stipulation Selecting Mediator" which was filed at DKT # 14. Counsel stated she is going to refile it in the correct civil matter. (ztc) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/19 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsey H. Hazelton on behalf of The Whitesboro Board of Education, The Whitesboro Central School District (Hazelton, Lindsey) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/14 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank W. Miller on behalf of All Defendants (Miller, Frank) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 08/05 12:13 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Whitesboro Central School District et al filed by Misha N., Paul N.. Motion returnable before Judge Mae D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 8/26/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/3/2024 (de Oliveira, Carlo Alexandre) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order/Judgment | ||
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 08/05 8:21 AM
CLERKS NOTICE Re9 Clerks Entry of Default as to the Whitesboro Board of Education and The Whitesboro Central School District: Counsel is directed to file the appropriate motion for default judgment within 30 days from the date of this notice. Please consult Local Rule 55.2(a) and (b) with respect to the procedure that must be followed seeking judgment by default, now that this clerks entry has been entered.(ban) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/02 11:27 AM
TEXT ORDER re9 Clerk's Entry of Default: Based on the filing of a Clerk's Entry of Default the Rule 16 conference set for 9/23/2024, and related civil case management plan/mandatory disclosure deadline are cancelled. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 8/2/2024. (ztc) |
|
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 08/02 10:33 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT noted and entered as to The Whitesboro Board of Education and The Whitesboro Central School District, re:8 Request for Entry of Default. (see) |
|
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Fri 08/02 10:21 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY regarding document no.8 entered by counsel as a Motion for Default Judgment. The entry was modified to state it is a Request for Entry of Default and motion was terminated. (see) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 08/01 4:31 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Whitesboro CSD and Whitesboro Board of Edu filed by Misha N., Paul N.. Motion returnable before Judge Mitchell J. Katz Response to Motion due by 8/22/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/29/2024 (de Oliveira, Carlo Alexandre) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 08/01 1:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: On 07/16/2024, plaintiff filed proofs of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants on 7/9/2024. The time for defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 8/8/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 8/1/2024. (ztc) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/16 10:52 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kimberly Bural, District Clerk on 7/9/2024, filed by Misha N., Paul N.. (Steck, Phillip) Modified on 7/16/2024 (see, ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/16 10:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kimberly Bural, District Clerk on 7/9/2024, filed by Misha N., Paul N.. (Steck, Phillip) Modified on 7/16/2024 (see, ) |
|
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Tue 07/16 11:48 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re5 Affidavit of Service,6 Affidavit of Service. Corrected the dates of service from 7/2/2024 to 7/9/2024. The date of 7/2/2024 was the date the process server received the documents for service. (see) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 07/16 11:49 AM
***Answer due date updated for The Whitesboro Board of Education answer due 7/30/2024; The Whitesboro Central School District answer due 7/30/2024. (see) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only)
Tue 06/25 12:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (see) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Tue 06/25 12:01 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/23/2024 at 02:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/16/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/25 11:31 AM
Summonses Issued as to The Whitesboro Board of Education and The Whitesboro Central School District.(see) |
|
Att: 1 Summons for Whitesboro Board of Education | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/25 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against The Whitesboro Board of Education and The Whitesboro Central School District (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6776749) filed by Paul N. and Misha N.(see) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |