Tracy Peace v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03680 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Peace
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 7:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Stacy Miller, II on behalf of Margaret Carver, Mark Carver, Jeffrey Mayben, Sara Mayben, Dennis Fitzgerald, Donald Hoolahan, Rhonda Hoolahan, Tracy Peace, James Feggestad, Karen Feggestad, Anita Campos, Carlos Campos, Scott Means, Sarah Burke, William Thomas Burke, Jeannette Ralston, Ronnie Ralston, Rex Ticknor, Vickie Ticknor, Kay Istre, Randall Istre Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Miller, William) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/10 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan McCollum on behalf of Tracy Peace (McCollum, Ryan) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/08 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MaryAnne M Hamilton on behalf of Carlos Campos, Dennis Fitzgerald, Tracy Peace Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-03678-RMG, 2:24-cv-03679-RMG, 2:24-cv-03680-RMG(Hamilton, MaryAnne) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 06/26 9:00 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/25/2024), Tracy Peace v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03680-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Kentucky (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/26 8:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 8:21 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11843650.), filed by Tracy Peace. Service due by 9/23/2024 (mbon) |