Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00924
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 12:33 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
David Drishpon
Represented By
Kristin Nealey Meier
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erpizo LLC
Represented By
Richard E Spoonemore
Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger
contact info
Eleanor Hamburger
Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger
contact info
Defendant
Tesserae Technologies LLC
Represented By
Kristin Nealey Meier
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Benjamin S. Klehr
Small Herrin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Spears
Represented By
Richard E Spoonemore
Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger
contact info
Eleanor Hamburger
Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger
contact info
Plaintiff
Surface Art Inc
Represented By
Jason E Fellner
Fellner Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
43 43 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines Mon 04/07 5:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: This matter comes before the Court, sua sponte . To accommodate conflicts in the Court's schedule, the Court hereby RESETS the Pretrial Conference and certain deadlines in the Court's29 Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates. Pretrial Conference is hereby reset for 6/5/2026 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs are now due by 5/29/2026. Pretrial Order is now due by 5/26/2026. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/04 9:34 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Tesserae Technologies LLC, David Drishpon, TO RESPONSE to40 MOTION to Dismiss (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
41 41 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/25 12:49 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc, to40 MOTION to Dismiss . (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
40 40 motion Dismiss Tue 02/04 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Tesserae Technologies LLC, David Drishpon. Noting Date 3/4/2025, (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
39 39 misc Praecipe-Other Wed 01/22 4:25 PM
PRAECIPE re38 Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs(Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
notice Notice re Lack of Proper Signature Wed 01/22 1:50 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The38 Amended Complaint was improperly signed by LINDSEY A. MORGAN . As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with LCR 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . Please file either a Notice of Appearance OR a corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing or file. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
38 38 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 10:28 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Surface Art Inc.(Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 02, 2025
37 37 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 01/02 1:09 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Erpizo LLC. (Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
36 36 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 2:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Tesserae Technologies LLC. (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/18 4:35 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's21 First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants Tesserae Technologies, LLC, and Erpizo, LLC, SHALL file amended corporate disclosure statements that comport with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Civil Rule 7.1 no later than 1/6/2025. If Plaintiff files a Second Amended Complaint, it SHALL do so no later than 1/20/2025. Defendants Tesserae Technologies, LLC, and David Drishpon's27 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Tana Lin.(MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 12/17 2:09 PM
ORDER denying as moot Defendants Tesserae and Drishpon's18 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's duplicate23 First Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 12:17 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by Mark Spears.(Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 11/08 3:23 PM
Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added for Mark Spears; per31 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/07 4:02 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Tesserae Technologies LLC, David Drishpon, TO RESPONSE to27 MOTION to Dismiss (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard E Spoonemore on behalf of Defendant Mark Spears. (Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 11/07 3:58 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by Erpizo LLC.(Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
29 29 order TL Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Thu 10/31 4:56 PM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Tana Lin. 7-10 Day Jury Trial is set for 6/22/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 12/26/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/24/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/24/2025, Discovery Motions due by 12/24/2025, Discovery completed by 1/23/2026, Dispositive motions due by 2/20/2026, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/24/2026, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/23/2026, Motions in Limine due by 5/18/2026, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 6/5/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2026 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Thu 10/31 10:34 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc, to27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Thu 10/10 2:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants David Drishpon, Tesserae Technologies LLC. Noting Date 11/7/2024, (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/10 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re21 Amended Complaint Amended Summons, and Proof of Service (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
25 25 misc Joint Status Report Wed 10/09 4:37 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7 to 10 days. Filed by Defendant Tesserae Technologies LLC.(Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
24 24 misc Errata Wed 10/02 3:12 PM
ERRATA (Document No. 23) by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/27 10:52 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Surface Art Inc.(Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons First Amended Summons in a Civil Action,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service
22 22 service Summons Issued Fri 09/27 9:55 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mark Spears. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/26 3:47 PM
Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Surface Art Inc.(Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons First Amended Summons in a Civil Action,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
20 20 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 2:04 PM
ORDER re19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin S. Klehr for DEFENDANTS David Drishpon and Tesserae Technologies LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
19 19 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/10 1:30 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin S. Klehr FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants David Drishpon, Tesserae Technologies LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8620458 (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Fri 09/06 12:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants David Drishpon, Tesserae Technologies LLC. Noting Date 10/4/2024, (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/23 9:20 AM
ORDER. The Parties'16 Stipulated Request to Extend the Defendants' Response to the Complaint is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/6/2024. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
16 16 misc Request Thu 08/22 1:58 PM
REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (STIPULATED REQUEST) re Notice to Filer, Set/Reset Deadlines,1 Complaint,13 Notice-Other (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 order TL Joint Status Report Order (Form) Wed 08/14 3:01 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/11/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/25/2024, Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
14 14 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 3:35 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Erpizo LLC. (Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/07 1:05 PM
Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties'13 Notice/Stipulation. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, Defendants 'Response to the Complaint is extended to 8/23/2024. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
13 13 notice Notice-Other Mon 08/05 2:00 PM
NOTICE Stipulated Notice to Extend Deadline re1 Complaint, ; filed by Defendants David Drishpon, Tesserae Technologies LLC. (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 08/05 1:59 PM
Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added for Erpizo LLC; per12 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard E Spoonemore on behalf of Defendant Erpizo LLC. (Spoonemore, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
11 11 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 4:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Tesserae Technologies LLC. (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/29 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Nealey Meier on behalf of Defendants David Drishpon, Tesserae Technologies LLC. (Meier, Kristin)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Mon 07/29 3:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on TESSERAE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC on 7/17/2024, filed by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc. (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Mon 07/29 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ERPIZO, LLC on 7/17/2024, filed by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc. (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Mon 07/29 3:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to David Drishpon on 7/18/2024, filed by Plaintiff Surface Art Inc. (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 3:01 PM
DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by Surface Art Inc. (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 2:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Surface Art Inc. (Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
4 4 order TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures Fri 06/28 10:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures] . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
Related: [-]
3 3 order TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 06/28 10:07 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/27 10:26 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to Defendants David Drishpon, Erpizo LLC, Tesserae Technologies LLC (KS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/27 10:16 AM
Judge Tana Lin added. (KS)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 06/27 10:19 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Surface Art Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/5/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents. (KS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/26 6:08 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Jason E Fellner added to party Surface Art Inc(pty:pla) filed by Surface Art Inc.(Fellner, Jason)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8521333
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons For David Drishpon,
Att: 3 Summons For ERPIZO LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Tesserae Technologies LLC