Franco et al v. City of Bulverde et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00708 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 6:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Bulverde
|
|
Defendant
Charles West
|
|
Plaintiff
Maria Franco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susana Huerta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Maria Franco, Susana Huerta, re3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by Defendant Charles West, Defendant City of Bulverde(Langenfeld, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/09 10:03 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Susana Huerta, Maria Franco.(Langenfeld, David) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/26 5:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by City of Bulverde, Charles West.(Rodriguez, Clarissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/28 9:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susana Huerta, Maria Franco as to All Defendants. (Langenfeld, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18918660). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Susana Huerta, Maria Franco.(Langenfeld, David) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/26 11:50 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Wed 06/26 11:51 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg) |