FORD v. RAH OF WASHINGTON D.C., INC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01846 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
RAH OF WASHINGTON, DC, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
TEAL FORD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/19 10:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by TEAL FORD. (Wilkenfeld, Ari) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 08/19 11:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of4 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/19/24. (lce) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service
Mon 07/01 10:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. RAH OF WASHINGTON D.C., INC d/b/a/ CAMELOT SHOWBAR waiver sent on 6/28/2024, answer due 8/27/2024. (Wilkenfeld, Ari) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 06/26 3:57 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to RAH OF WASHINGTON D.C., INC d/b/a/ CAMELOT SHOWBAR.(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice and Consent | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/26 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against RAH OF WASHINGTON D.C., INC d/b/a/ CAMELOT SHOWBAR with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10986255) filed by TEAL FORD.(Wilkenfeld, Ari) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/26 3:52 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmtm) |